There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Virgin Islands National Park School Lease Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Virgin Islands National Park School Lease Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to enter into a long-term lease with the Government of the United States Virgin Islands to provide land on the island of Saint John, Virgin Islands, for the establishment of a school, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
10/22/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H11790-11791)
10/22/2007Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-399.
01/04/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/23/2008SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
10/23/2007SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
10/22/2007-3:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/22/2007-3:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H11790-11791)
10/22/2007-2:58pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 53.
10/22/2007-2:58pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11790-11791)
10/22/2007-2:58pmHouseMrs. Christensen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/22/2007HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 253.
10/22/2007HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-399.
10/10/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/10/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/20/2007HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Insular Affairs
09/20/2007HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Insular Affairs
07/09/2007HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Insular Affairs
02/07/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Insular Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/04/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/04/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources01/04/2007 Referred to
10/10/2007 Markup by
10/22/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-399
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Insular Affairs02/07/2007 Referred to
07/09/2007 Hearings by
09/20/2007 Markup by
09/20/2007 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources10/23/2007 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks04/23/2008 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.53.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.53. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/22/2007)

Virgin Islands National Park School Lease Act of 2007 - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to lease certain Virgin Islands National Park land on the island of Saint John, U.S. Virgin Islands, to the Government of the U.S. Virgin Islands for the purpose of establishing a school on such island.

Limits the lease authorized by this Act to a 99-year term.

Allows the Secretary to require such additional terms and conditions in connection with the lease as the Secretary considers appropriate to protect U.S. interests.