Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/04/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/04/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/13/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/14/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/14/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/14/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/01/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/08/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/08/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/08/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/10/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/23/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/30/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/05/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/05/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/05/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/21/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/04/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/12/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/12/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/12/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/18/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/26/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/10/2008