There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Commerce to sell or exchange certain National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration property located in Norfolk, Virginia, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
10/13/2008Became Public Law No: 110-393. (TXT | PDF)
10/13/2008Signed by President.
10/03/2008Presented to President.
09/29/2008Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H10615)
09/26/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/17/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 9/15/2008 H8055)
09/12/2008Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
08/01/2008Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-822, Part I.
02/12/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (34)

Date Chamber
10/13/2008Became Public Law No: 110-393. (TXT | PDF)
10/13/2008Signed by President.
10/03/2008HousePresented to President.
09/29/2008-2:39pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2008-2:39pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H10615)
09/29/2008-2:39pmHouseMr. Rahall asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10615)
09/27/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/26/2008SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2008SenateS.Amdt.5663 Amendment SA 5663 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2008SenateS.Amdt.5663 Amendment SA 5663 proposed by Senator Whitehouse for Senator Shelby. (consideration: CR S9851; text: CR S9851) To provide authority to NOAA to enter a no cost land lease for a NOAA facility.
09/26/2008SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S9851)
09/22/2008SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/17/2008-7:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/17/2008-7:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 9/15/2008 H8055)
09/17/2008-7:02pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8368-8369)
09/15/2008-2:45pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Bishop (UT) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
09/15/2008-2:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5350.
09/15/2008-2:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8054-8058)
09/15/2008-2:22pmHouseMs. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/12/2008HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 542.
09/12/2008HouseCommittee on Oversight and Government discharged.
08/01/2008HouseHouse Committee on Oversight and Government Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 12, 2008.
08/01/2008HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-822, Part I.
07/16/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
07/16/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/04/2008HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, and Oceans
06/04/2008HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, and Oceans
04/24/2008HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, and Oceans
02/14/2008HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/12/2008HouseReferred to House Oversight and Government Reform
02/12/2008HouseReferred to House Natural Resources
02/12/2008HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/12/2008HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E167)
02/12/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 02/12/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/12/2008 Referred to
07/16/2008 Markup by
08/01/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-822
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, and Oceans02/14/2008 Referred to
04/24/2008 Hearings by
06/04/2008 Markup by
06/04/2008 Reported by
House Oversight and Government Reform02/12/2008 Referred to
09/12/2008 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5350. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-393 (10/13/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Authorizes the Secretary of Commerce to sell or exchange to the city of Norfolk, Virginia, certain real property under the administrative jurisdiction of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA), including land and improvements, located in Norfolk, if the Secretary: (1) determines that such conveyance is in the best interests of NOAA and the federal government; and (2) has provided prior notification to the appropriate congressional committees.

Requires the proceeds of any conveyance under this Act to be made available for: (1) activities related to the operations of, or capital improvements to, NOAA property; or (2) relocation and other costs associated with the sale or exchange.

Authorizes the Secretary, through the Under Secretary and the Administrator of NOAA, to enter into a land lease with Mobile County, Alabama, for a period of not less than 40 years, on such terms and conditions as NOAA deems appropriate, for the construction of a Gulf of Mexico Disaster Response Center facility, provided that the lease is at no cost to the Government. Allows NOAA to enter into agreements with state, local, or county governments for the joint use, operations, and occupancy of such facility.