Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/12/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/01/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/01/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/01/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/19/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/19/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/29/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/29/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/26/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew