Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/16/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/16/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/16/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/16/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/16/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/16/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/01/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/01/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/15/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/15/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/25/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/16/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/07/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/07/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/07/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/18/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/23/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/13/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/17/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/16/2008