Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/13/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/12/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 07/10/2008
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/22/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/01/2008