Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/25/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/25/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/25/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/25/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/25/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/25/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/25/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/25/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/25/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/25/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/26/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/28/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/28/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/28/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/28/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/28/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/28/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/11/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/11/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/11/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/11/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/11/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/11/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/11/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/11/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/11/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/11/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/11/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/11/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/11/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/11/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/11/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/12/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/13/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/14/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/31/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/10/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/10/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/16/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/16/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/22/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/23/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/23/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/24/2008
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/29/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/30/2008