Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/25/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/01/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/16/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/08/2008