There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

United States-Republic of Korea Defense Cooperation Improvement Act of 2008

Short Titles as Introduced

United States-Republic of Korea Defense Cooperation Improvement Act of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve defense cooperation between the Republic of Korea and the United States.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/23/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8626-8627)
02/14/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/02/2008SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
09/24/2008SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/23/2008-3:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/23/2008-3:20pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8626-8627)
09/23/2008-3:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5443.
09/23/2008-3:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8626-8628)
09/23/2008-3:10pmHouseMr. Higgins moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/14/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
02/14/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/28/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/04/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/04/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/05/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/05/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/05/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/06/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/12/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/12/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/12/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/13/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/14/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/14/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/14/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/31/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/03/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/03/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/03/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/03/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/03/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/08/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/08/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/08/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/09/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/14/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/15/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/16/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/16/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/22/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/22/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/22/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/22/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/18/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs02/14/2008 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations10/02/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5443. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/23/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

United States-Republic of Korea Defense Cooperation Improvement Act of 2008 - Amends the Arms Export Control Act to include the Republic of Korea among those countries given preferential consideration with respect to certain: (1) arms export presidential certification and legislative review requirements; and (2) military training reporting requirements.