Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/28/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/04/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/04/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/05/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/05/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/05/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/06/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/12/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/12/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/12/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/13/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/14/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/14/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/14/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/31/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/03/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/03/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/03/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/03/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/03/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/08/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/08/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/08/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/09/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/14/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/15/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/16/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/16/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/22/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/22/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/22/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/22/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/18/2008