Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/25/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/26/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/27/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/27/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/27/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/27/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/27/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/27/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/27/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/27/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/03/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/03/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/03/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/06/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/06/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/13/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/13/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/02/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/09/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/09/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/15/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/21/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/22/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/11/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/09/2008