Text: H.R.5445 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2008)


110th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 5445


To amend part B of title XVIII of the Social Security Act to increase Medicare payments for physicians’ services through December 31, 2009.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

February 14, 2008

Mr. Price of Georgia (for himself and Mr. Scott of Georgia) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned


A BILL

To amend part B of title XVIII of the Social Security Act to increase Medicare payments for physicians’ services through December 31, 2009.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Purpose.

The purpose of this Act is to allow adequate time for Congress to determine an appropriate long-term solution for Medicare physician reimbursement rates.

SEC. 2. Increase in Medicare physician payments through 2009.

Section 1848(d) of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 1395w–4(d)), as amended by section 101(a) of the Medicare, Medicaid, and SCHIP Extension Act of 2007 (Public Law 110–173), is amended by adding at the end the following new paragraph:

“(9) UPDATE FOR REMAINDER OF 2008 AND FOR 2009.—

“(A) IN GENERAL.—Subject to paragraphs (7)(B) and (8)(B), in lieu of the update to the single conversion factor established in paragraph (1)(C) that would otherwise apply—

“(i) for 2008, for the period beginning on July 1, 2008, and ending on December 31, 2008, the update to the single conversion factor shall be 1.0 percent; or

“(ii) for 2009, the update to the single conversion factor shall be 1.8 percent.

“(B) NO EFFECT ON COMPUTATION OF CONVERSION FACTOR FOR 2010 AND SUBSEQUENT YEARS.—The conversion factor under this subsection shall be computed under paragraph (1)(A)—

“(i) for 2009, treating the update under subparagraph (A)(i) as if it had applied for the entire period of 2008; and

“(ii) for 2010 and subsequent years as if subparagraph (A) had never applied.”.