Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/03/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/03/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/03/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/03/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/03/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/04/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/04/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/06/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/06/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/12/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/12/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/31/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/31/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/31/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/31/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/31/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/08/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/09/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/09/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/09/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/10/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/10/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/15/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/15/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/15/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/15/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/15/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/22/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/22/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/22/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/05/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/05/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/07/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/07/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/07/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/12/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/12/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/13/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/21/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/24/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/16/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/08/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/23/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/23/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/29/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/19/2008