Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/29/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/29/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/29/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/29/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/29/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/29/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/29/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/29/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 01/29/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/29/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/29/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/29/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/29/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/29/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 01/29/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/29/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/29/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/29/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/06/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/06/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/06/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/14/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/13/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/19/2007