There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Modernize Our Bookkeeping In the Law for Employee's Cell Phone Act of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to remove cell phones from listed property under section 280F.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2008 Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/14/2008 Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2008 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/14/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/25/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/25/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/06/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/06/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/14/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/14/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/14/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/14/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/14/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/14/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/14/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/14/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/14/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/14/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/14/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/14/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/14/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/14/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/14/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/01/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/01/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/01/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/01/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/03/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/03/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/10/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/15/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/29/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/05/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/14/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/14/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/22/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/10/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/29/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/08/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/14/2008 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (9)

  • Business records
  • Depreciation and amortization
  • Income tax
  • Tax deductions
  • Telephone
  • Wireless communication

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5450. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2008)

Modernize Our Bookkeeping In the Law for Employee's Cell Phone Act of 2008 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to remove certain limitations on the tax deduction for employee use of cellular telephones.