Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/26/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/26/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/26/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/27/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/27/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/28/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/28/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/28/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/12/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/31/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/14/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/14/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/14/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/15/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/21/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/21/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/22/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/04/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/09/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/09/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/09/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/23/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/24/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/08/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/17/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/17/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/31/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/15/2008