Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/14/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/14/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/14/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/26/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/26/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/26/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/26/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/04/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/04/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/05/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/13/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/31/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/03/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/05/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/22/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/08/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/16/2008