Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/04/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/04/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/05/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/06/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/02/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/30/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/19/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew