Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/25/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/25/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/27/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/27/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/27/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/06/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/06/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/06/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/13/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/14/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/31/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/31/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/31/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/31/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/09/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/17/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/05/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/26/2008