There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide grants for the revitalization of waterfront brownfields.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
02/15/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/14/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/14/2008Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2008Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2008Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2008Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E198)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2008Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/31/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/03/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/14/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/21/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/03/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/05/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/19/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/15/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/09/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/11/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/15/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/17/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/18/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/26/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/14/2008 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Hazardous Materials02/14/2008 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/14/2008 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment02/15/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5469.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5469. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2008)

Amends the Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act of 1980 to require the President to establish a grant program for the revitalization of waterfront brownfield sites. Authorizes such grants to be used for reuse planning, site characterization and assessment, or remediation at waterfront brownfields sites, including the integration of activities related to the design and implementation of water quality improvements, low impact development approaches, green infrastructure, remediation and management of sediments, or flood damage prevention associated with brownfields remediation and reuse.

Authorizes the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to provide training, research, and technical assistance to individuals and organizations to facilitate waterfront brownfields revitalization.

Authorizes funding for brownfields revitalization for FY2008-FY2012.

Requires the Administrator to establish and serve as chairperson of a task force on waterfront brownfields revitalization that shall identify: (1) funding and technical assistance resources; (2) barriers to and solutions for revitalization; and (3) methods to coordinate interagency efforts.