Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/14/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/31/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/03/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/14/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/21/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/03/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/05/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/19/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/15/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/09/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/11/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/15/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/17/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/18/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/26/2008