Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
05/07/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-225.
05/07/2008 Signed by President.
05/01/2008 Presented to President.
04/22/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3269-3270)
04/09/2008 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 177).(text: CR H2083)
02/14/2008 Introduced in House