Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/03/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/03/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/03/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/03/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/03/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/03/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/03/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/03/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/03/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/03/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/03/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/03/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/03/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/03/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/03/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/03/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/03/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/06/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/06/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/06/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/06/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/06/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/14/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/14/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/14/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/14/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/14/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/14/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/14/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/14/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/31/2008