Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/19/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 02/19/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/21/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/21/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/21/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/21/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/21/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/21/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/27/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/27/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/27/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/28/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/04/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/04/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/13/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/14/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/03/2008