Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/02/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/02/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/09/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/09/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/09/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/09/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/10/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/10/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/10/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/14/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/15/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/23/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/23/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/13/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/13/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/13/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/22/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/05/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/05/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/19/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/19/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/22/2008