There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 6892 Main Street in Gloucester, Virginia, as the "Congresswoman Jo Ann S. Davis Post Office".


Actions Overview (6)

Date
05/07/2008Became Public Law No: 110-226. (TXT | PDF)
05/07/2008Signed by President.
05/01/2008Presented to President.
04/22/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3269-3270)
04/09/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 397 - 0 (Roll no. 176).(text: CR H2081)
02/26/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
05/07/2008Became Public Law No: 110-226. (TXT | PDF)
05/07/2008Signed by President.
05/01/2008HousePresented to President.
04/23/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/22/2008SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3269-3270)
04/10/2008SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
04/09/2008-6:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/09/2008-6:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 397 - 0 (Roll no. 176). (text: CR H2081)
04/09/2008-6:49pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2121)
04/09/2008-11:11amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/09/2008-10:54amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5489.
04/09/2008-10:54amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2081-2083)
04/09/2008-10:54amHouseMr. Clay moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/13/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
03/13/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/26/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
02/26/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform02/26/2008 Referred to
03/13/2008 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5489. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-226 (05/07/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 6892 Main Street in Gloucester, Virginia, as the "Congresswoman Jo Ann S. Davis Post Office."