Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/13/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/13/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/13/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/13/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/13/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/13/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/01/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/02/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 04/02/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/02/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/02/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/02/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/02/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/02/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/02/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/02/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/02/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/02/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/02/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/22/2008