There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that the usual day for paying salaries in or under the House of Representatives may be established by regulations of the Committee on House Administration.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
05/06/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/06/2008Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/15/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2297)
04/14/2008Reported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 110-588.
02/26/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/07/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/06/2008SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/06/2008SenateS.Amdt.4712 Amendment SA 4712 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/06/2008SenateS.Amdt.4712 Amendment SA 4712 proposed by Senator Reid. (consideration: CR S3837; text: CR S3837) To propose a technical amendment relating to Senate pay periods.
05/06/2008SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3836-3837)
05/06/2008SenateSenate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/29/2008SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
04/16/2008SenateReceived in the Senate.
04/15/2008-2:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/15/2008-2:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2297)
04/15/2008-2:47pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5493.
04/15/2008-2:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2297-2298)
04/15/2008-2:46pmHouseMr. Brady (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/14/2008HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 363.
04/14/2008HouseReported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 110-588.
04/02/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
04/02/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
02/26/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
02/26/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/01/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/01/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Committee on House Administration02/26/2008 Referred to
04/02/2008 Markup by
04/14/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-588
Senate Rules and Administration04/29/2008 Referred to
05/06/2008 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.5493.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5493. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (05/06/2008)

Amends the Legislative Branch Appropriations Act, 2002 to authorize the Committee on House Administration, by regulation, to provide for the payment of salaries with respect to a month on a date other than the date provided under the Act as may be necessary to conform to generally accepted accounting practices.

(Currently, the usual day for paying salaries in or under the House of Representatives is the last day of each month; except that if the last day of a month falls on a Saturday, Sunday, or a legal public holiday, the Chief Administrative Officer of the House pays such salaries on the first weekday which precedes the last day.)

Makes technical amendments to the federal criminal code with respect to the one-year ban on lobbying contacts by certain former officers and staff of the Senate and personal, committee, and leadership staff of the House of Representatives. Changes from at least 60 days to more than two months during the one-year period before their service terminated their payment of a salary equal to or greater than 75% of the salary of the Member of the chamber in which he or she was employed.

Makes the same change with respect to specified employees of other legislative offices.

Amends Rule XXXVII (Conflict of Interest) of the Standing Rules of the Senate to make the same change with respect to its one-year ban on lobbying contacts by a former Senate officer or employee (with any Senator or Senate officer or employee).