Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/17/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/29/2008