Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/18/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/05/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/05/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/05/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/05/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/05/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/05/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/05/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/05/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/05/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/05/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/05/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/16/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 02/16/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/09/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/09/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/09/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/09/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/09/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/09/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/09/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/09/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/09/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/09/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/26/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/26/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/26/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/26/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/24/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/24/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/24/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/24/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/24/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/24/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/24/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/24/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 04/24/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/24/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/24/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/24/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/03/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/03/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/03/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/03/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/03/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/15/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/15/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/15/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/15/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/15/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/15/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/15/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/24/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/06/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/06/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/06/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/06/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/19/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/19/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/19/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/19/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/19/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/19/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 06/19/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/19/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/30/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/30/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/23/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/20/2008