There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Noble Warrior Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles 10 and 38, United States Code, to improve and enhance procedures for the retirement of members of the Armed Forces for disability and to improve and enhance authorities for the rating and compensation of service-connected disabilities in veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/28/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
03/14/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
02/29/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/28/2008Referred to House Rules
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2008Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2008Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2008Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2008Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/05/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/22/2008

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/28/2008 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs02/29/2008 Referred to
House Armed Services02/28/2008 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel03/14/2008 Referred to
House Rules02/28/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5509. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/28/2008)

Noble Warrior Act - Amends federal armed forces provisions to add new provisions concerning the retirement for disability of members of the Armed Forces (members) following the implementation of an enhanced Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) disability compensation system (implemented under this Act).

Authorizes the Secretary of Defense to continue after discharge or separation from active duty respite care and aid and other extended care benefits for members who incur a serious injury or illness while serving on such duty.

Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (Secretary) to conduct a study to determine the appropriate: (1) amount of compensation for service-connected disability payable to veterans for each assigned rating of disability; and (2) amounts and duration of transition payments and rehabilitation transition allowances payable to veterans participating in a rehabilitation program.

Requires the Secretary to conduct a study on measures to assist and encourage veterans in the completion of their vocational rehabilitation plans.

Directs the Secretary to submit to Congress a proposal on the purposes and amounts of veterans' disability compensation and veterans' transition benefits. Provides for congressional consideration (by way of a joint resolution) of such proposal.

Makes the effective date of implementation of the enhanced VA disability compensation system the date on which the authority of Congress to disapprove the Secretary's proposal expires, as long as Congress does not disapprove the proposal before such date.

Revises the current VA schedule of disability ratings to take into account losses of earning capacity and quality of life as a result of the disability. Provides revised compensation and transition payments in connection with service-connected disabilities.

Allows a retired veteran entitled to compensation for a service-connected disability to elect to provide a monthly supplemental survivor benefit to the veteran's surviving spouse and/or children. Authorizes such election by veterans: (1) at the time of award of the disability compensation; (2) not married at the time of award of the compensation who later marry; and (3) married at the time of award of the compensation who later remarry. Allows a veteran to revoke the election of a benefit to a surviving spouse. Provides for the receipt of such benefit on the first day of the first month after the veteran dies. Requires the: (1) reduction of disability compensation due to the election of the supplemental survivor benefit; and (2) offset of the supplemental survivor benefit by the amount of dependency and indemnity compensation received.