Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/11/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/13/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/13/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/31/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/31/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/14/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/17/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/23/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/30/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/30/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/12/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/08/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/11/2008