Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/28/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/28/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/28/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/06/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/06/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/10/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/10/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/14/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/14/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/14/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/14/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/14/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/14/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/14/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/10/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/23/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 05/05/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/14/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/21/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/26/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew