Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
07/15/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-271.
07/15/2008 Signed by President.
07/10/2008 Presented to President.
06/27/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6331)
06/25/2008 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
04/15/2008 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 191).(text: CR 4/14/2008 H2231)
02/28/2008 Introduced in House