Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/05/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/10/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/13/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/13/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/02/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/08/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/14/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/14/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/22/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/23/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 09/15/2008