Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/10/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/10/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/11/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/12/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/13/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/13/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/14/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/02/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/02/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/02/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/09/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/09/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/09/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/09/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/10/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/14/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/14/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/16/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/16/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/16/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/16/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/16/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/16/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/17/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/17/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/17/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/17/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/17/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/17/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/17/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/22/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/23/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/24/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/08/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/12/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/12/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/13/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/14/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/19/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/19/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/24/2008
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/24/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/24/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/25/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/16/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/22/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/22/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew