Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/05/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/05/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/05/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/05/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/05/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/08/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/08/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/19/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/19/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/19/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/19/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/19/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/19/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/19/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/26/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/26/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/26/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/26/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/26/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/15/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/15/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/15/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/15/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/15/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/15/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/15/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/15/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/30/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/30/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/30/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/30/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/30/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/30/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/03/2008