There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Chesapeake Bay Gateways and Watertrails Network Continuing Authorization Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Chesapeake Bay Gateways and Watertrails Network Continuing Authorization Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Chesapeake Bay Gateways and Watertrails Network Continuing Authorization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Chesapeake Bay Initiative Act of 1998 to provide for the continuing authorization of the Chesapeake Bay Gateways and Watertrails Network.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/05/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 321 - 86 (Roll no. 386).
05/22/2008Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-667.
03/05/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber
08/01/2008SenateRead twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 930.
06/06/2008SenateReceived in the Senate.
06/05/2008-3:30pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 321 - 86 (Roll no. 386).
06/05/2008-3:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/05/2008-3:22pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 181 - 223 (Roll no. 385).
06/05/2008-3:06pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H5015)
06/05/2008-3:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with ten minutes of debate on the Sali motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to enhance public education and access to the Chesapeake Bay.
06/05/2008-2:56pmHouseMr. Sali moved to recommit with instructions to Natural Resources. (consideration: CR H5014; text: CR H5014)
06/05/2008-2:56pmHouseH.Amdt.1076 On agreeing to the Bishop (UT) amendment (A001) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 178 - 232 (Roll No. 384).
06/05/2008-2:30pmHouseH.Amdt.1076 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A001) and on the bill pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H5014)
06/05/2008-2:18pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1233, the House proceeded with twenty minutes of debate on the Bishop (UT) amendment.
06/05/2008-2:18pmHouseH.Amdt.1076 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Bishop (UT). (consideration: CR H5012-5014; text: CR H5012)
06/05/2008-1:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5540.
06/05/2008-1:12pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 5540 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order. All points of order against consideration of the bill are waived except those arising under clause 9 or 10 of rule XXI.
06/05/2008-1:12pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1233. (consideration: CR H5004-5016; text of measure as reported in House: CR H5004)
06/05/2008-12:47pmHouseRule H. Res. 1233 passed House.
06/03/2008-7:26pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1233 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5540 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order. All points of order against consideration of the bill are waived except those arising under clause 9 or 10 of rule XXI.
05/22/2008HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 419.
05/22/2008HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-667.
04/30/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
04/30/2008HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
04/30/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/24/2008HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands
03/06/2008HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/05/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/05/2008HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E310-311)
03/05/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/05/2008 Referred to
04/30/2008 Markup by
05/22/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-667
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands03/06/2008 Referred to
04/24/2008 Hearings by
04/30/2008 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5540. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (06/05/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Chesapeake Bay Gateways and Watertrails Network Continuing Authorization Act - Amends the Chesapeake Bay Initiative Act of 1998 to make permanent the authorization of appropriations for the Chesapeake Bay Gateways and Watertrails Network.