Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/08/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/10/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/22/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/29/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/19/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/22/2008