Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/12/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/03/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/09/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/10/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/17/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/22/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/29/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/30/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/13/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/13/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/04/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/17/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/17/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/30/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/08/2008