Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/11/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/06/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/20/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/04/2008