Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/13/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/13/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/13/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/06/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/20/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/04/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/17/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/19/2008