Refine your search

Showing 11 of 11 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
07/26/2007 Became Public Law No: 110-49.
07/26/2007 Signed by President.
07/18/2007 Presented to President.
07/11/2007 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 370 - 45 (Roll no. 614).(consideration: CR H7558-7559; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7452-7455)
06/29/2007 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
06/29/2007 Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/28/2007 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 423 - 0 (Roll no. 110).
02/23/2007 Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
02/23/2007 Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
02/23/2007 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 110-24, Part I.
01/18/2007 Introduced in House