Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/06/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/06/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/06/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/06/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/06/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/14/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/14/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/14/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/14/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/14/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/14/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/31/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/31/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/31/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/22/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/22/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/22/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/05/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/10/2008