There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Economic Stimulus Act of 2008 to provide for a temporary increase in the maximum loan guaranty amount for housing loans guaranteed by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/10/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/14/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/10/2008Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/10/2008Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/10/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/10/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/01/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/10/2008 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity03/14/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5566. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/10/2008)

Amends the Economic Stimulus Act of 2008 to provide a temporary increase, during the period beginning February 13, 2008, and ending on December 31, 2008, in the maximum veterans' loan guaranty amount for housing loans guaranteed by the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA).