Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/10/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/10/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/10/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/10/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/15/2008