Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/15/2008)

Religious Worker Visa Extension Act of 2008 - Directs the Secretary of Homeland Security to issue final regulations to eliminate or reduce fraud in the special immigrant non-minister religious worker program by December 31, 2008.

Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to: (1) extend the special immigrant program for non-minister religious workers until January 1, 2010; and (2) extend the program until January 1, 2016, (to be effective March 1, 2009) if the Secretary issues such final regulations by December 31, 2008.

Directs the Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security to report to Congress on such regulations' effectiveness by September 30, 2010. Requires that such report shall include an analysis of a random sample of non-minister special immigrant religious workers, before their second anniversary of being admitted, to determine whether they are still employed by the religious organization that petitioned for them, and if not, the reasons for their departure from such employment.