Text: H.R.5571 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-362 (10/08/2008)

 
[110th Congress Public Law 362]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


[DOCID: f:publ362.110]

[[Page 122 STAT. 4013]]

Public Law 110-362
110th Congress

                                 An Act


 
  To extend for 5 years the program relating to waiver of the foreign 
  country residence requirement with respect to international medical 
    graduates, and for other purposes. <<NOTE: Oct. 8, 2008 -  [H.R. 
                                5571]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. EXTENSION OF WAIVER PROGRAM.

    Section 220(c) of the Immigration and Nationality Technical 
Corrections Act of 1994 (8 U.S.C. 1182 note) is amended by striking 
``June 1, 2008'' and inserting ``March 6, 2009''.
SEC. 2. EXPANDING THE FLEXIBILITY OF THE CONRAD STATE 30 PROGRAM.

    Section 214(l)(1)(D)(ii) of the Immigration and Nationality Act (8 
U.S.C. 1184(l)(1)(D)(ii)) is amended by striking ``5'' and inserting 
``10''.
SEC. 3. SENSE OF CONGRESS.

    It is the sense of the Congress that--
            (1) Federal programs waiving the 2-year foreign residence 
        requirement under section 212(e) of the Immigration and 
        Nationality Act (8 U.S.C. 1182(e)) for physicians are generally 
        designed to promote the delivery of critically needed medical 
        services to people in the United States lacking adequate access 
        to physician care; and
            (2) when determining the qualification of a location for 
        designation as a health professional shortage area, the 
        Secretary of Health and Human Services should consider the needs 
        of vulnerable populations in low-income and impoverished 
        communities, communities with high infant mortality rates,

[[Page 122 STAT. 4014]]

        and communities exhibiting other signs of a lack of necessary 
        physician services.

    Approved October 8, 2008.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 5571:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 110-646 (Comm. on the Judiciary).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 154 (2008):
            May 19, 21, considered and passed House.
            Sept. 26, considered and passed Senate, amended.
            Sept. 27, House concurred in Senate amendment.

                                  <all>