Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/10/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/10/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/31/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/31/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/31/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/31/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/31/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/31/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/31/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/08/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/08/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/08/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/08/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/08/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/08/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/08/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/08/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/08/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/08/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/09/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/09/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/09/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/30/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/30/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/30/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/07/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/07/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/07/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/13/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/20/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/20/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/20/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/20/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/20/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/20/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/20/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/20/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/21/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/21/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/21/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/22/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/22/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/22/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/03/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/03/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/03/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/04/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/04/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/04/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/09/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/09/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/17/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/17/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/18/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/18/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/15/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/16/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/17/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/31/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/26/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/19/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 11/19/2008