Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/31/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/03/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/03/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/03/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/09/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/15/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/31/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/11/2008